NE LB284 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change sales and use tax provisions relating to out-of-state retailers and multivendor marketplace platforms
Title
Change sales and use tax provisions relating to out-of-state retailers and multivendor marketplace platforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Linehan AM643 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Legislature - Revenue AM392 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Legislature - Linehan AM540 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Linehan AM643 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Legislature - Revenue AM392 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Legislature - Linehan AM540 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Linehan AM643 adopted |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Linehan AM643 filed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER44 adopted |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER44 filed |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER44 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Linehan AM540 adopted |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Linehan AM540 filed |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Revenue AM392 adopted |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | McCollister priority bill |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Revenue AM392 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM392 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |