NE LB29 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide and eliminate telehealth provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide and eliminate telehealth provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Kolterman AM367 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM86 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 21, 2019
2019-03-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 15, 2019
2019-03-15LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-03-15LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2019-03-12LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-03-07LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-02-28LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2019-02-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-02-21LegislatureKolterman AM367 adopted
2019-02-21LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM86 adopted
2019-02-20LegislatureKolterman AM367 filed
2019-02-14LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM86 filed
2019-02-14LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM86
2019-01-29LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 06, 2019
2019-01-14LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback