NE LB293 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB202 amended into LB293 by AM1503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB202 amended into LB293 by AM1503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide, change, and eliminate provisions relating to appropriations
Title
Provide, change, and eliminate provisions relating to appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-2-2 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Stinner MO89 prevailed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Chambers MO88 failed (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Chambers MO86 failed (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Chambers MO85 failed (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Chambers MO84 failed (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1503 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Stinner MO89 prevailed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Chambers MO88 failed (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Chambers MO86 failed (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Chambers MO85 failed (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Chambers MO84 failed (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1503 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB202 amended into LB293 by AM1503 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-2-2 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Stinner MO89 prevailed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Stinner MO89 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO88 failed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO88 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO86 failed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO86 Bracket until June 6, 2019 filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO85 failed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO85 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO84 failed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO84 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER106 adopted |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER106 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER106 |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1503 adopted |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1503 filed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1503 |
2019-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |