NE LB294 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB678 amended into LB294 by AM1329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB678 amended into LB294 by AM1329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for the expenses of Nebraska State Government for the biennium ending June 30, 2021
Title
Appropriate funds for the expenses of Nebraska State Government for the biennium ending June 30, 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 35-12-2 (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Motion to return to Select File failed (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Stinner MO98 prevailed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Bolz AM1746 adopted (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Stinner MO95 prevailed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Clements FA79 lost (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Stinner MO91 failed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1329 adopted (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Friesen AM1667 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Motion to return to Select File failed (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Stinner MO98 prevailed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Bolz AM1746 adopted (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Stinner MO95 prevailed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Clements FA79 lost (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Stinner MO91 failed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1329 adopted (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Friesen AM1667 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB678 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB404 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB403 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB327 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB292 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB199 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB181 amended into LB294 by AM1746 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB174 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB129 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 35-12-2 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Erdman AM1866 withdrawn |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Stinner MO98 prevailed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Stinner MO98 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | La Grone AM1638 withdrawn |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | La Grone AM309 withdrawn |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | La Grone AM308 withdrawn |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Erdman AM1866 filed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Bolz AM1746 adopted |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Stinner MO95 prevailed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Stinner MO95 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Clements FA79 lost |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Clements FA79 pending |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Clements FA79 filed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Bolz AM1746 pending |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Clements FA73 withdrawn |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | La Grone AM1638 filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Clements FA73 filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Stinner MO91 failed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Stinner MO91 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Chair ruled there had not been full and fair debate on AM1746 |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Bolz AM1746 pending |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER109 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Bolz AM1746 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER109 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER109 |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1329 adopted |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Friesen AM1667 adopted |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Friesen AM1667 pending |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Friesen AM1667 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1329 pending |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1329 filed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1329 |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Speaker major proposal |
2019-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | La Grone AM309 filed |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | La Grone AM308 filed |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |