NE LB309 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the number of district court judges in Douglas County
Title
Increase the number of district court judges in Douglas County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Legislature - Lathrop AM706 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Legislature - La Grone AM471 lost (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Chambers MO16 failed (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Legislature - Lathrop AM706 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Legislature - La Grone AM471 lost (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Chambers MO16 failed (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Lathrop AM706 adopted |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Lathrop AM706 filed |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | La Grone AM477 withdrawn |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | La Grone AM471 lost |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | La Grone AM471 refiled |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | La Grone AM471 withdrawn |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Chambers MO17 withdrawn |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | La Grone AM477 filed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | La Grone AM471 filed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO17 pending |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO17 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO16 failed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO16 pending |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO16 pending |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO16 Bracket until June 6, 2019 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |