NE LB32 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change defined contribution benefit investment options as prescribed under the County Employees Retirement Act and State Employees Retirement Act
Title
Change defined contribution benefit investment options as prescribed under the County Employees Retirement Act and State Employees Retirement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |