NE LB33 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change various provisions relating to retirement and the Nebraska Investment Council and the Public Employees Retirement Board
Title
Change various provisions relating to retirement and the Nebraska Investment Council and the Public Employees Retirement Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM4 adopted (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM4 adopted (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER7 adopted |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER7 filed |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER7 |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM4 adopted |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM4 filed |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM4 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |