NE LB332 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB332 amended into LB600 by AM1650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB332 amended into LB600 by AM1650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change eligibility requirements and other provisions of the Young Adult Bridge to Independence Act
Title
Change eligibility requirements and other provisions of the Young Adult Bridge to Independence Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB332 amended into LB600 by AM1650 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM629 filed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM629 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Bolz AM557 filed |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 07, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37234 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB332.pdf |