NE LB33A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Date of introduction |