NE LB34 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB565 amended into LB34 by AM591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB565 amended into LB34 by AM591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change various retirement provisions
Title
Change various retirement provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Kolterman AM915 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM591 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Kolterman AM915 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM591 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB565 amended into LB34 by AM591 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB36 amended into LB34 by AM591 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB35 amended into LB34 by AM591 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Chambers FA43 withdrawn |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Chambers FA43 filed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Kolterman AM915 adopted |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER54 adopted |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER54 filed |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER54 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Kolterman AM915 filed |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM591 adopted |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM591 filed |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM591 |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |