NE LB348 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt changes to the state building code
Title
Adopt changes to the state building code
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Quick [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-6-2 (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-6-2 |
2019-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |