NE LB354 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to sealing of juvenile records
Title
Change provisions relating to sealing of juvenile records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Legislature - Judiciary AM112 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Legislature - Judiciary AM112 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER46 adopted |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER46 filed |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER46 |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Judiciary AM112 adopted |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Judiciary AM112 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM112 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |