NE LB36 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine creditable service, change a payment deadline for restoration of relinquished creditable service, and change payment requirements and service credit computation provisions under the School Employees Retirement Act
Title
Redefine creditable service, change a payment deadline for restoration of relinquished creditable service, and change payment requirements and service credit computation provisions under the School Employees Retirement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB36 amended into LB34 by AM591 |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37553 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB36.pdf |