NE LB375 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain library, archive, and museum materials to be withheld from the public
Title
Allow certain library, archive, and museum materials to be withheld from the public
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-1-4 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 13, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |