NE LB390 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB772 amended into LB390 by AM2663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB772 amended into LB390 by AM2663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to unlawful possession of a firearm at a school and Emergency Management Act provisions
Title
Change provisions relating to unlawful possession of a firearm at a school and Emergency Management Act provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB772 amended into LB390 by AM2663 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB694 amended into LB390 by AM2710 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 22, 2014 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Larson explanation of vote |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 17, 2014 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers AM2848 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Schilz AM2762 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Seiler AM2770 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Harr AM2750 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER234 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers AM2848 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Schilz AM2762 filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Seiler AM2770 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Harr AM2750 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER234 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER234 |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Davis AM2663 adopted |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Seiler AM2710 adopted |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Seiler AM2710 filed |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Judiciary AM507 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Davis AM2663 filed |
2014-02-26 | Legislature | Pirsch name added |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Christensen priority bill |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Judiciary AM507 filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM507 |
2013-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2013 |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |