NE LB42 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change motor vehicle provisions relating to child passenger restraint requirements
Title
Change motor vehicle provisions relating to child passenger restraint requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 40-2-7 (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 40-2-7 |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER124 adopted |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER124 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER124 |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1965 adopted |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1965 filed |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1965 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Hilkemann priority bill |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |