NE LB424 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1178 amended into LB424 by AM2568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1178 amended into LB424 by AM2568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Nebraska Municipal Land Bank Act
Title
Change the Nebraska Municipal Land Bank Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Quick [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Erdman MO206 failed (Y: 12 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 31-12-6 (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Quick MO229 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Quick AM3290 adopted (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM509 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Quick AM2847 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Legislature - Hilgers FA101 lost (Y: 19 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Legislature - Wayne AM2568 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Legislature - Quick AM2122 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Legislature - Quick MO81 failed (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 31-12-6 (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Quick MO229 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Quick AM3290 adopted (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM509 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Quick AM2847 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Legislature - Hilgers FA101 lost (Y: 19 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Legislature - Wayne AM2568 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Legislature - Quick AM2122 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Legislature - Quick MO81 failed (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1178 amended into LB424 by AM2568 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 11, 2020 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 31-12-6 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Quick MO229 prevailed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Quick MO229 Invoke cloture filed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Erdman MO206 failed |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Erdman MO206 Bracket until August 13, 2020 filed |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Quick AM3290 adopted |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Quick AM3290 filed |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Quick AM3227 withdrawn |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Quick AM3032 withdrawn |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER223 adopted |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Quick AM3227 filed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER223 filed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER223 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM509 adopted |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Quick AM2847 adopted |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Quick AM2847 pending |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Quick AM2686 withdrawn |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Hilgers FA102 withdrawn |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM509 pending |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Quick AM3032 filed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Quick AM2847 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Quick AM2686 filed |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Hilgers FA102 pending |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Hilgers FA101 lost |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hilgers FA102 filed |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hilgers FA101 pending |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hilgers FA101 filed |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM2568 adopted |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Quick AM2122 adopted |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Quick AM2122 pending |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Quick AM1513 withdrawn |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1400 withdrawn |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1402 withdrawn |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1404 withdrawn |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1403 withdrawn |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1401 withdrawn |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM509 pending |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Wayne AM2568 filed |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Stinner priority bill |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Quick AM2122 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1400 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1402 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1404 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Quick MO81 failed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Quick MO81 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | La Grone MO82 withdrawn |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | La Grone MO82 Bracket until June 5, 2019 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO80 withdrawn |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO80 Bracket until June 6, 2019 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1401 pending |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM509 pending |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Quick AM1513 filed |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1403 filed |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1401 pending |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1401 pending |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1401 filed |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM509 pending |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM509 pending |
2019-04-04 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Stinner priority bill |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM509 filed |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM509 |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |