NE LB477 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an income tax exemption for Segal AmeriCorps Education Awards
Title
Provide an income tax exemption for Segal AmeriCorps Education Awards
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 39-4-6 (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Vargas AM2098 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Vargas AM2098 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 13, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 39-4-6 |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER144 adopted |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER144 filed |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER144 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Vargas AM2098 adopted |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Vargas AM2098 filed |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019 |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Quick name added |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |