NE LB487 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB296 amended into LB487 by AM568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB296 amended into LB487 by AM568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide and change immunity provisions relating to naloxone and asthma and allergic reactions and change provisions of the Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Title
Provide and change immunity provisions relating to naloxone and asthma and allergic reactions and change provisions of the Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 34-5-10 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 34-5-10 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 34-5-10 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB296 amended into LB487 by AM568 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB293 amended into LB487 by AM568 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB167 amended into LB487 by AM568 |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 34-5-10 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER47 adopted |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER47 filed |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER47 |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Morfeld AM822 adopted |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Morfeld AM822 filed |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Judiciary AM568 adopted |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Judiciary AM568 filed |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM568 |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Judiciary priority bill |
2017-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2017 |
2017-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2017 (cancel) |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |