NE LB508 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Impose sales and use taxes on certain services, eliminate sales tax exemptions, and use the increased revenue for property tax credits.
Title
Impose sales and use taxes on certain services, eliminate sales tax exemptions, and use the increased revenue for property tax credits.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37412 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB508.pdf |