NE LB511 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize adjustments to state employee work schedules for participation in approved youth mentoring programs
Title
Authorize adjustments to state employee work schedules for participation in approved youth mentoring programs
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM1843 adopted (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM672 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM1843 adopted (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM672 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST27 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM1843 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Brewer AM1113 withdrawn |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER56 adopted |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM1843 filed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Brewer AM1113 filed |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER56 filed |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER56 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM672 adopted |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM672 filed |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM672 |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | La Grone name added |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |