NE LB532 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to harassment protection orders, sexual assault protection orders, and domestic abuse protection orders
Title
Change provisions relating to harassment protection orders, sexual assault protection orders, and domestic abuse protection orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Cavanaugh AM1773 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hilgers AM1596 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - Judiciary AM674 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Cavanaugh AM1773 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hilgers AM1596 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - Judiciary AM674 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST37 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM1773 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1596 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM1773 filed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1596 filed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM54 withdrawn |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Judiciary AM674 adopted |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Judiciary AM674 filed |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM674 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Hilkemann priority bill |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM54 filed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |