NE LB545 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Games of Skill Act, provide for excise taxes, and use proceeds to reduce school district property tax levies
Title
Adopt the Games of Skill Act, provide for excise taxes, and use proceeds to reduce school district property tax levies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |