NE LB548 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB548 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB548 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the consolidation of the Class V school employees' retirement system and the School Employees Retirement System of the State of Nebraska
Title
Provide for the consolidation of the Class V school employees' retirement system and the School Employees Retirement System of the State of Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB548 amended into LB1005 by AM2204 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1758 withdrawn |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1652 withdrawn |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1506 withdrawn |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2595 lost |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM1529 withdrawn |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2595 pending |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2595 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2595 |
2018-02-07 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2018-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2018, on AM1758 |
2018-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2018, on AM1529 |
2018-02-05 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2018-02-05 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1758 filed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1652 filed |
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM1529 filed |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1506 filed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31725 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB548.pdf |