NE LB550 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require voter approval of fees and taxes on wireless services and eliminate the Prepaid Wireless Surcharge Act
Title
Require voter approval of fees and taxes on wireless services and eliminate the Prepaid Wireless Surcharge Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Wayne AM1393 pending |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Wayne AM1393 filed |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM530 pending |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Vargas AM1373 withdrawn |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Wayne MO65 withdrawn |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Wayne MO65 pending |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Wayne MO65 Bracket until June 6, 2019 filed |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Vargas AM1373 pending |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Vargas AM1373 filed |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM530 pending |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM530 filed |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM530 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Vargas priority bill |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37823 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB550.pdf |