NE LB559A | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB559A amended into LB961 by AM2895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB559A amended into LB961 by AM2895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB559A amended into LB961 by AM2895 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Chambers AM2834 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=23817 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB559A.pdf |