NE LB564 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Civic and Community Center Financing Act
Title
Change the Civic and Community Center Financing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM1276 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM1276 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER122 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER122 filed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER122 |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1276 adopted |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1276 filed |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1276 |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |