NE LB583 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide powers for certain cities, counties, and joint entities under the Transportation Innovation Act
Title
Provide powers for certain cities, counties, and joint entities under the Transportation Innovation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Bostelman AM1556 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Chambers MO72 failed (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Hilgers AM1490 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Bostelman AM1556 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Chambers MO72 failed (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Hilgers AM1490 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST33 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Bostelman AM1556 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Bolz AM1454 withdrawn |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER103 adopted |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Bostelman AM1556 filed |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Bolz AM1454 filed |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER103 filed |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER103 |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Chambers MO73 withdrawn |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Chambers MO73 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Chambers MO72 failed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Chambers MO72 Bracket until June 5, 2019 filed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1490 adopted |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1490 filed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Hilgers AM523 withdrawn |
2019-03-26 | Legislature | Hilgers AM523 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Arch priority bill |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |