NE LB603 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change automatic teller machine fees
Title
Change automatic teller machine fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |