NE LB607 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Returned by Governor without approval on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to nail technology and body art

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to nail technology and body art

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 31-10-8 (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1462 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-18LegislatureReturned by Governor without approval on August 17, 2020
2020-08-13LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 13, 2020
2020-08-13LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-13LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 31-10-8
2020-08-13LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2020-08-11LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-08-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-08-11LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER169 adopted
2020-02-18LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER169 filed
2020-02-18LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER169
2020-02-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-02-11LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1462 adopted
2020-02-03LegislatureBlood name added
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-04-25LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1462 filed
2019-04-25LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1462
2019-02-05LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2019
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback