NE LB607A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Returned by Governor without approval on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Returned by Governor without approval on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 28-10-11 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Kolterman AM2165 adopted (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Kolterman AM2165 adopted (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on August 17, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 13, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 28-10-11 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST80 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2165 adopted |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2165 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |