NE LB618 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Wayne explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Wayne explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the use of the Transportation Network Company Regulation Cash Fund
Title
Change provisions relating to the use of the Transportation Network Company Regulation Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 23, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER102 adopted |
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER102 filed |
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER102 |
2018-01-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |