NE LB637 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize sales of tourism promotional products by the Nebraska Tourism Commission
Title
Authorize sales of tourism promotional products by the Nebraska Tourism Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM238 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM238 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER64 adopted |
2019-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER64 filed |
2019-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER64 |
2019-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-04 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM238 adopted |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM238 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM238 |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |