NE LB639 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB639 amended into LB1038 by AM2688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB639 amended into LB1038 by AM2688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide authority for the Department of Roads to issue permits to control roadside vegetation as prescribed
Title
Provide authority for the Department of Roads to issue permits to control roadside vegetation as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB639 amended into LB1038 by AM2688 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2025 filed |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2025 |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |