NE LB640 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Property Tax Credit Act and provide school district property tax relief
Title
Change provisions of the Property Tax Credit Act and provide school district property tax relief
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Baker MO301 pending |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Baker MO301 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Groene AM2445 adopted |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Chambers MO300 withdrawn |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Chambers MO300 Recommit to Revenue Committee filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Friesen AM1065 withdrawn |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Briese AM1036 withdrawn |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Revenue AM752 pending |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2645 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2644 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2643 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2642 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2641 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2640 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2639 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2638 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2637 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2636 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Baker AM2635 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Groene AM2445 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Groene priority bill |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Baker MO88 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Friesen AM1065 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Briese AM1036 pending |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Briese AM1036 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Groene AM992 adopted |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Groene AM992 pending |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Revenue AM752 pending |
2017-04-12 | Legislature | Groene AM992 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Revenue AM752 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM752 |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Friesen priority bill |
2017-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31527 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB640.pdf |