NE LB671 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate provisions relating to hunting and killing of mountain lions
Title
Eliminate provisions relating to hunting and killing of mountain lions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Communication |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO181 Reconsider the override vote on MO161, that the bill becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO180 Permit reconsideration of MO175, to reconsider the vote that the bill becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor 28-21-0 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO161 failed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO175 prevailed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO175 Reconsider the vote that the bill becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor 24-21-4 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO161 failed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Chambers MO161 Becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on March 28, 2014 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with the Emergency Clause stricken 28-13-8 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 28-13-8 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Larson AM2533 withdrawn |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | McCoy AM2534 withdrawn |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA271 withdrawn |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Larson AM2533 filed |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | McCoy AM2534 filed |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO147 withdrawn |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO147 Bracket until April 17, 2014 filed |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA271 pending |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA271 filed |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File pending |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-02-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-02-28 | Legislature | Davis AM2138 withdrawn |
2014-02-28 | Legislature | Davis AM2138 filed |
2014-02-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER142 adopted |
2014-02-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER142 filed |
2014-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER142 |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM1637 adopted |
2014-02-13 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM1637 filed |
2014-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1637 |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Chambers priority bill |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |