NE LB675 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB431 amended into LB675 by AM1308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB431 amended into LB675 by AM1308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to education
Title
Change provisions relating to education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Groene AM1675 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Groene AM1499 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Education AM1308 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Groene AM1675 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Groene AM1499 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Education AM1308 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB431 amended into LB675 by AM1308 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST26 |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Groene AM1675 adopted |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER108 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Groene AM1675 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER108 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER108 |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Wayne AM1567 withdrawn |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Wayne AM1567 filed |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Wayne MO39 withdrawn |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Wayne FA31 withdrawn |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Wayne FA30 withdrawn |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Wayne FA29 withdrawn |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Wayne FA28 withdrawn |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Wayne FA27 withdrawn |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Groene AM1499 adopted |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Education AM1308 adopted |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Groene AM1499 filed |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Education AM1308 filed |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1308 |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Wayne MO39 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2019-03-26 | Legislature | Wayne FA31 filed |
2019-03-26 | Legislature | Wayne FA30 filed |
2019-03-26 | Legislature | Wayne FA29 filed |
2019-03-26 | Legislature | Wayne FA28 filed |
2019-03-26 | Legislature | Wayne FA27 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Education priority bill |
2019-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |