NE LB695 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize and define smart contracts and authorize use of distributed ledger technology as prescribed
Title
Authorize and define smart contracts and authorize use of distributed ledger technology as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2018-02-06 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33913 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB695.pdf |