NE LB705 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for distribution of funds upon death from an achieve a better life experience account
Title
Provide for distribution of funds upon death from an achieve a better life experience account
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Murman AM2778 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Revenue AM162 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Murman AM2778 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Revenue AM162 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Murman AM2778 adopted |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Murman AM2778 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Revenue AM162 adopted |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Revenue AM162 filed |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM162 |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |