NE LB720A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1977 filed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |