NE LB740 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB740 amended into LB909 by AM2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB740 amended into LB909 by AM2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for registration and licensing of metropolitan utilities district motor vehicles and trailers as prescribed
Title
Provide for registration and licensing of metropolitan utilities district motor vehicles and trailers as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB740 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33949 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB740.pdf |