NE LB744 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Provide for adoption of the National Electrical Code by the State Electrical Board
Title
Provide for adoption of the National Electrical Code by the State Electrical Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-29 | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to General Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9397 |