NE LB749 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt indoor tanning services from sales and use taxes
Title
Exempt indoor tanning services from sales and use taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-03-15 | Placed on General File | |
2012-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2012 | |
2012-01-06 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2012-01-04 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15773 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB749.pdf |