NE LB75 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to township libraries
Title
Change provisions relating to township libraries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Legislature - General Affairs AM341 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Legislature - General Affairs AM341 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA88 withdrawn |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER115 adopted |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA88 filed |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER115 filed |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER115 |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | General Affairs AM341 adopted |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-01 | Legislature | General Affairs AM341 filed |
2021-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM341 |
2021-01-21 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |