NE LB750 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Provide for gifts of real property to the Board of Educational Lands and Funds
Title
Provide for gifts of real property to the Board of Educational Lands and Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-12 | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Education Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9339 |