NE LB768 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB846 amended into LB768 by AM1945
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB846 amended into LB768 by AM1945
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Livestock Brand Act and estray provisions
Title
Change provisions of the Livestock Brand Act and estray provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Schilz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB846 amended into LB768 by AM1945 |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2014 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 31, 2014 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Davis AM2610 withdrawn |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Davis AM2610 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Larson AM2658 withdrawn |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Larson AM2658 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Larson AM2401 lost |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Larson AM2401 filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER163 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER163 filed |
2014-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER163 |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Agriculture AM1945 adopted |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Larson AM2219 withdrawn |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Larson AM2219 pending |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Larson AM2219 filed |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Agriculture AM1945 pending |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Agriculture AM1945 filed |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1945 |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Agriculture priority bill |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2014-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |