NE LB77 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Real Property Appraiser Act and the Nebraska Appraisal Management Company Registration Act
Title
Change provisions of the Real Property Appraiser Act and the Nebraska Appraisal Management Company Registration Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST1 |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER2 adopted |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER2 filed |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER2 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |