NE LB780 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB943 amended into LB780 by AM2838
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB943 amended into LB780 by AM2838
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide duties for the Nebraska Arts Council regarding creative districts and change provisions relating to the Nebraska Arts and Humanities Cash Fund
Title
Provide duties for the Nebraska Arts Council regarding creative districts and change provisions relating to the Nebraska Arts and Humanities Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Hunt AM2838 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Hunt AM2838 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB943 amended into LB780 by AM2838 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER213 adopted |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER213 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER213 |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Hunt AM2838 adopted |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Hunt AM2838 filed |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Appropriations priority bill |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |