NE LB781 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/portions of LB781 amended into LB824 by AM2080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/portions of LB781 amended into LB824 by AM2080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change bond provisions relating to the gallonage tax on alcoholic liquor
Title
Change bond provisions relating to the gallonage tax on alcoholic liquor
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/portions of LB781 amended into LB824 by AM2080 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on General File | |
2012-01-12 | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2012 | |
2012-01-10 | Brasch name added | |
2012-01-06 | Referred to General Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-04 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15287 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB781.pdf |