NE LB794 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB794 amended into LB1107 by AM2293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB794 amended into LB1107 by AM2293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change operating requirements regarding intoxicating beverages in cosmetology, esthetics, and nail technology salons
Title
Change operating requirements regarding intoxicating beverages in cosmetology, esthetics, and nail technology salons
Sponsors
Sen. Merv Riepe [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB794 amended into LB1107 by AM2293 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2000 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2000 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 17, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34341 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB794.pdf |